EP0490648 - Pharmaceutical agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Timko, Robert Joseph ICI Americas Inc., Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | 02 /
Clements, Arlene ICI Americas Inc., Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | 03 /
Bradway, Randy John 5 Raleigh Drive Downingtown, Pennsylvania 19335 / US | 04 /
Holohan, James Joseph Hurdsfield Ind. Estate, Macclesfield Works Hurdsfield Road, Macclesfield, Cheshire / GB | 05 /
Edwards, Ieuan John Hurdsfield Ind.Estate, Macclesfield Works Hurdsfield Road, Macclesfield, Cheshire / GB | [1994/24] |
Former [1994/10] | 01 /
Timko, Robert Joseph ICI Americas Inc., Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | ||
02 /
Clements, Arlene ICI Americas Inc., Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | |||
03 /
Bradway, Randy John 5 Raleigh Drive Downingtown, Pennsylvania 19335 / US | |||
04 /
Holohan, James Joseph Hurdsfield Ind. Estate, Macclesfiedl Works Hurdsfield Road, Macclesfield, Cheshire / GB | |||
05 /
Edwards, Ieuan John Hurdsfield Ind.Estate, Macclesfield Works Hurdsfield Road, Macclesfield, Cheshire / GB | |||
Former [1992/25] | 01 /
Timko, Robert Joseph ICI Americas Inc., Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | ||
02 /
Clements, Arlene ICI Americas Inc., Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | |||
03 /
Bradway, Randy John 5 Raleigh Drive Downingtown, Pennsylvania 19335 / US | Representative(s) | Denerley, Paul Millington, et al Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Chesire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Denerley, Paul Millington, et al Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Chesire SK10 4TG / GB | ||
Former [1992/25] | Hay, Martin Alexander Legal Dept: Patents, PO Box 6, Shire Park, Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311504.4 | 11.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | GB19900027014 | 12.12.1990 Original published format: GB 9027014 | GB19910015107 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115107 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490648 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0490648 | Date: | 19.04.1994 | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490648 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/40, A61K9/20, A61K47/32 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
C07D209/40 (EP,US);
C07D209/30 (KR);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/27] |
Former [1992/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Arzneimittel | [1992/25] | English: | Pharmaceutical agents | [1992/25] | French: | Agents pharmaceutiques | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0199543 (ICI AMERICA INC [US]) |