Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0490681
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
30.11.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] |
30.09.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] |
23.08.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
12.07.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] |
01.06.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] |
14.10.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] |
12.11.1993 |
First examination report |
|
12.12.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] |
30.04.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |