Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3224408B | Global Dossier | 29.10.2001 | B2 | JPH0543288 | 23.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32906091 | 12.12.1991 | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU640545B | Global Dossier | 26.08.1993 | B2 | AU8893791 | 01.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0490681 | Global Dossier | 30.11.1994 | B1 | EP0490681 | 17.06.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE114620T | 15.12.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2057358 | 13.06.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69105466T | 13.04.1995 | T2 | DE69105466D1 | 12.01.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2064924T | 01.02.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100220203B | 01.09.1999 | B1 | KR920011949 | 25.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ240960 | 28.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5223036 | 29.06.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA919677 | 28.10.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | JP40174990 | 12.12.1990 |