EP0493921 - Valve disc and drive shaft assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.1992 [1992/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTR plc Silvertown House Vincent Square London SW1P 2PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states BTR plc Silvertown House Vincent Square London SW1P 2PL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haseley, Philip John 10 The Spinney, Church Aston Newport, Shropshire / GB | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Treves, Barry William, et al Invensys plc Intellectual Property, Knights House, 2 Parade Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B72 1PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Treves, Barry William, et al BTR Group Patent & Trade Mark Service P.O. Box 504, Fort Dunlop Erdington Birmingham B24 9QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311650.5 | 16.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | GB19910000107 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: GB 9100107 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493921 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/22 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
F16K1/221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/28] | Title | German: | Ventilscheibe und dessen Antriebswelleneinheit | [1992/28] | English: | Valve disc and drive shaft assembly | [1992/28] | French: | Disque de soupape et son assemblage d'arbre d'entraînement | [1992/28] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0019496 ; | [A]FR2511743 ; | [A]EP0069491 |