blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0493927

EP0493927 - Phosphate esters and compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.02.1999
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.1999Refusal of applicationpublished on 31.03.1999 [1999/13]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [1995/32]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1992/28]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Suk Hyung
670 Tilden Avenue
Teaneck, New Jersey 07666 / US
[1992/28]
Representative(s)Elliott, Peter William
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/37]Elliott, Peter William
Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [1992/28]Ford, Michael Frederick
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date91311695.017.12.1991
[1992/28]
Priority number, dateUS1990062824317.12.1990         Original published format: US 628243
US1990062825017.12.1990         Original published format: US 628250
[1992/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0493927
Date:08.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.1992
ClassificationIPC:C07F9/09, A61K7/075, A61K7/48
[1992/28]
CPC:
C11D1/345 (EP); A61K8/55 (EP); A61Q11/00 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP); A61Q5/02 (EP); C07F9/091 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/28]
TitleGerman:Phosphat-Ester und sie enthaltende Zusammensetzungen[1998/19]
English:Phosphate esters and compositions containing them[1992/28]
French:Esters phosphate et composition les contenant[1992/28]
Former [1992/28]Phosphat-Estern und sie enthaltende Zusammensetzungen
Examination procedure25.01.1993Examination requested  [1993/17]
22.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
04.11.1998Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/13]
14.11.1998Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.01.1993M01   Fee paid on   25.01.1993
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199808   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2185541  (CAHN FRANK J);
 [X]US2962516  (EMILE CHERBULIEZ, et al);
 [A]US4197316  (VAN SCOTT EUGENE J [US], et al);
 [A]EP0371803  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al)
ExaminationEP0381803
by applicantUS4197316
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.