EP0493945 - Process for producing grain-oriented electrical steel sheet having low watt loss [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ushigami, Yoshiyuki Nippon Steel Corp. Technical Dev. Bureau, 1-1-1, Edamitsu Yahatahigashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP | 02 /
Suga, Yozo Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Dev. Bureau, 1-1-1, Edamitsu Yahatahigashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP | 03 /
Nagashima, Takeo Nippon Steel Corp. Technical Dev. Bureau, 1-1-1, Edamitsu Yahatahigashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311850.1 | 20.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | JP19910000023 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: JP 2391 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493945 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493945 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/12 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
C21D8/1283 (EP,US);
C21D9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen kornorientierter Elektrobleche mit niedrigen Wattverlusten | [1992/28] | English: | Process for producing grain-oriented electrical steel sheet having low watt loss | [1992/28] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de toles d'acier électrique à grains orientés et à pertes de watt faibles | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/34] | 21.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP58067871 ; | [A]JP60128213 ; | [A]JP59067372 ; | [A]JP54106009 ; | [A]JP2228481 ; | [A]JP62070525 ; | [A]EP0219611 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 155 (C-175) & JP-A-58 067 871 ( SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU ) 22 April 1983, & JP58067871 A 19830422 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 283 (C-313)9 November 1985 & JP-A-60 128 213 ( SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU ), & JP60128213 A 19851109 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 168 (C-236)3 August 1984 & JP-A-59 067 372 ( SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK ), & JP59067372 A 19840803 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 128 (C-062)24 October 1979 & JP-A-54 106 009 ( NIPPON STEEL CORP ), & JP54106009 A 19791024 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 539 (C-782)28 November 1990 & JP-A-22 28 481 ( NIPPON STEEL CORP ), & JP2228481 A 19901128 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 268 (C-444)29 August 1987 & JP-A-62 070 525 ( NIPPON STEEL CORP ), & JP62070525 A 19870829 |