EP0497058 - Video coding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/32] | Highly efficient coding apparatus | ||
[1996/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Tetsujiro c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311940.0 | 23.12.1991 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | JP19900417504 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41750490 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0497058 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0497058 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497058 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N5/92 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/63 (EP,US);
H04N19/42 (KR);
H04N19/10 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (KR);
H04N19/197 (KR);
H04N5/9261 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/08] | H04N7/13, H04N5/92 | ||
Former IPC [1992/32] | H04N7/13, // H04N5/92 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/32] | Title | German: | Bildkodiervorrichtung | [1996/45] | English: | Video coding apparatus | [1996/45] | French: | Dispositif de codage de vidéo | [1996/45] |
Former [1992/32] | Kodiervorrichtung mit hoher Wirksamkeit | ||
Former [1992/32] | Highly efficient coding apparatus | ||
Former [1992/32] | Dispositif de codage à haute efficacité | Examination procedure | 09.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0152355 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [A]US4845560 (KONDO TETSUJIRO [JP], et al); | [AP]EP0413570 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A] - PECOT M., TOURTIER P. J., THOMAS Y., "COMPATIBLE CODING OF TELEVISION IMAGES. \PART 2. COMPATIBLE SYSTEM.", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19901001), vol. 02., no. 03., doi:10.1016/0923-5965(90)90003-Z, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 259 - 268., XP000233217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(90)90003-Z |