Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] |
28.04.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |
25.03.1994 | First examination report | |
05.06.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] |
05.06.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] |