EP0495315 - Garbage processing vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O.K. LABORATORIES CO., LTD 10-13, Izumi 1-chome Okegawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states O.K. LABORATORIES CO., LTD 10-13, Izumi 1-chome Okegawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onodera, Kazuo 10-13, Izumi 1-chome Okegawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Hackett, Sean James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311952.5 | 23.12.1991 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | JP19900417622 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41762290 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495315 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495315 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65F3/22, B65F3/00, C05F17/02, C05F9/02 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
B65F3/00 (EP,US);
B09B5/00 (KR);
C05F17/914 (EP,US);
B65F3/22 (EP,US);
C05F9/02 (EP,US);
B65F2001/1489 (EP,US);
Y02A40/20 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US);
Y02P20/145 (EP,US);
Y02W30/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/30] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug für die Verarbeitung von Abfällen | [1992/30] | English: | Garbage processing vehicle | [1992/30] | French: | Camion pour le traitement de détritus | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57068198 ; | [Y]JP1017701 ; | [Y]US4101039 (TALENTI PIER F); | [X]DE3837865 (BOEHNENSIEKER FRANZ [DE]); | [A]DE3104769 (WEICHEL ERNST) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 149, 10th August 1982; & JP-A-57 068 198 (SETSUKO) 26-04-1982, & JP57068198 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 193, 9th May 1989; & JP-A-1 017 701 (TSUNEO), & JP1017701 A 00000000 |