EP0437393 - Process for the production and the extraction of antioxidants from a culture of microorganisms and a photobioreactor for performing the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HELIOSYNTHESE S.A. Centre d'Affaires Actimart Bureau 218 1140 rue Ampère 13795 Aix en Provence Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states HELIOSYNTHESE S.A. Centre d'Affaires Actimart Bureau 218 1140 rue Ampère F-13795 Aix en Provence Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states HELIOSYNTHESE S.A. 51, rue Saint Georges F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states USSI-INGENIERIE, (ETUDES ET REALISATIONS AGRO-ALIMENTAIRES E.R.A.) 116 Avenue Aristide Briand F-92223 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gudin, Claude 4 Traverse Sainte Anne, Le Parc F-13100 Aix en Provence / FR | 02 /
Thepenier, Catherine Les Restanques de la Thomassine F-04100 Manosque / FR | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Gandrille, Pierre, et al Société Brevatome Sté de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Gandrille, Pierre, et al Société Brevatome Sté de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/29] | Mongrédien, André c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400032.8 | 09.01.1991 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | FR19900000279 | 11.01.1990 Original published format: FR 9000279 | [1991/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437393 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437393 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/02, C12M1/00, C12P1/00, C12N1/12 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
C12M23/06 (EP,US);
C12M21/02 (EP,US);
C12M23/44 (EP,US);
C12M47/02 (EP,US);
C12N9/0089 (EP,US);
Y10S435/822 (EP,US);
Y10S435/946 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung und Extrahierung von Antioxydantien aus einer Mikroorganismenkultur und Fotobioreaktor zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1991/29] | English: | Process for the production and the extraction of antioxidants from a culture of microorganisms and a photobioreactor for performing the process | [1991/29] | French: | Procédé de production et d'extraction d'anti-oxydants à partir d'une culture de microorganismes et photobioréacteur pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1991/29] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0310522 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, 1977, page 213, colonne de droite, abrégé no. 147729z, Columbus, Ohio, US; H.P. MISRA et al.: "Purification and properties of superoxide dismutase from a red alga, Porphyridium cruentum", J. BIOL. CHEM. 1977, 252(18), 6421-3 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 74, 1971, page 99, colonne de droite, abrégé no. 29131g, Columbus, Ohio, US; N.J. ANTIA et al.: "Tocopherol, vitamin K, and related isoprenoid quinone composition of a unicellular red alga (Porphyridium cruentum)", & J. PHYCOL. 1970, 6(3), 305-12 |