EP0440566 - Plastic sleeve tube and its process of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROTUB B.P. No. 50, Zac de Chalançon No. 1 F-84270 Vedene / FR | [1991/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bove, Bruno 207, rue de l'Herbe F-84170 Montfavet / FR | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/32] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine ERNEST GUTMANN-YVES PLASSERAUD S.A., 67 boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400253.0 | 01.02.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | FR19900001256 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001256 | [1991/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440566 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440566 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0440566 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00, F16L37/08 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
F16L25/0045 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/114 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/232 (EP);
B29C66/5344 (EP);
B29C66/55 (EP);
F16L37/084 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Muffenrohr aus Kunststoff sowie Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [1991/32] | English: | Plastic sleeve tube and its process of manufacture | [1991/32] | French: | Tube à emboîtement en matériau plastique et procédé de fabrication d'un tel tube | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.1994
04.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE HEGLER PLASTIK GMBH Heglerstrasse 8 D-97714 Oerlenbach / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Manfred Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.1994
04.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE HEGLER PLASTIK GMBH Heglerstrasse 8 D-97714 Oerlenbach / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | 01.09.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.12.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.12.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.03.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.05.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.05.1996 | Appeal received No. T0484/96 | 01.08.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.03.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.10.1993 | GR | 27.10.1993 | SE | 02.02.1995 | [2000/05] |
Former [1999/30] | GB | 27.10.1993 | |
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 02.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2406211 (STEWING ALBERT); | [A]US4558889 (GANS LEO [US]); | [A]US4747621 (GANS LEO [US], et al) |