EP0448440 - Method of packaging pre-prepared vegetables, corresponding packaging line and pre-prepared vegetables packaged by this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCIADE FRAIS 1 rue Louis Pasteur F-41260 La Chaussée Saint Victor / FR | [1991/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamotte, René 14 rue de la Vallée F-41350 Vineuil / FR | 02 /
Marin, Olivier 14 rue de Normandie F-41000 Blois / FR | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard Novapat France 63bis Boulevard Bessières 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Kügele, Bernhard NOVAPAT FRANCE 63 bis, boulevard Bessières F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400639.0 | 07.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | FR19900003631 | 21.03.1990 Original published format: FR 9003631 | [1991/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448440 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/20, B65B29/10 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
B65B37/18 (EP);
B65B9/213 (EP);
B65D81/3261 (EP);
B65B2220/22 (EP);
B65B2230/02 (EP);
B65B9/2056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Konditionieren von gebrauchsfertigen Gemüsen oder eine Verpackungskette von auf diese Weise konditionierten gebrauchsfertigen Gemüsen | [1991/39] | English: | Method of packaging pre-prepared vegetables, corresponding packaging line and pre-prepared vegetables packaged by this method | [1991/39] | French: | Procédé de conditionnement de légumes prêts à l'emploi, ou chaine de conditionnement et légumes prêts à l'emploi ansi conditionnés | [1991/39] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/48] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3887346 ; | [Y]US3391047 ; | [A]EP0190776 ; | [A]CH609627 ; | [A]DE2652078 ; | [A]FR2348855 |