EP0451008 - 8-Sulfamylmethylene-2-amino tetralins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hibert, Marcel Domaine des Grands Prés, 21, rue Alfred Kastler F-67114 Eschau / FR | 02 /
Petty, Margaret A. 5, rue Schimper F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
Jones, C. Richard 13, rue du Kochersberg, Willgottheim F-67370 Truchtersheim / FR | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400770.3 | 21.03.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | EP19900400781 | 21.03.1990 Original published format: EP 90400781 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451008 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451008 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/35, A61K31/18 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
C07C311/35 (EP,KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
C07C2602/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | 8-Sulfamylmethylen-2-aminotetraline | [1991/41] | English: | 8-Sulfamylmethylene-2-amino tetralins | [1991/41] | French: | 8-Sulfamylméthylène-2-aminotétralines | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.1995 | ES | 28.06.1995 | GR | 28.06.1995 | IT | 28.06.1995 | SE | 28.09.1995 | DE | 29.09.1995 | DK | 21.03.1996 | GB | 21.03.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
GR | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
DE | 29.09.1995 | ||
DK | 21.03.1996 | ||
GB | 21.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
DE | 29.09.1995 | ||
DK | 21.03.1996 | ||
GB | 21.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
DE | 29.09.1995 | ||
DK | 21.03.1996 | ||
GB | 21.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
DE | 29.09.1995 | ||
GB | 21.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
DE | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 28.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3320521 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]); | [A]WO8404247 (RORER INT OVERSEAS [US]) |