EP0458661 - Therapeutical application of histamine H3 receptor agonists, new compounds and their use for the preparation of medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE CIVILE BIOPROJET 30, rue des Francs Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states SOCIETE CIVILE BIOPROJET 30, rue des Francs Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwartz, Jean Charles 9 Villa Seurat F-75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
Garbarg, Monique 26 Boulevard Gouvion Saint Cyr F-75017 Paris / FR | 03 /
Arrang, Jean Michel 11 Résidence du Chateau de Courcelles F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 04 /
Ganellin, Charon Robin Kinwood Briary Wood End, Welwyn Hertfordshire AL6 OTD / GB | 05 /
Lecomte, Jeanne Marie 30 rue des Francs-Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1995/34] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1991/48] | Bernasconi, Jean Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400889.1 | 02.04.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | FR19900004861 | 13.04.1990 Original published format: FR 9004861 | [1991/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458661 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458661 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, C07D233/64 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/48] | Title | German: | Therapeutische Anwendung von Histamin-H3-Agonisten, neue Wirkstoffe und Verwendung zur Herstellung von Arzneimitteln | [1991/48] | English: | Therapeutical application of histamine H3 receptor agonists, new compounds and their use for the preparation of medicaments | [1991/48] | French: | Application thérapeutique d'agonistes du récepteur H3 de l'histamine, nouveaux composés et utilisation pour la préparation de médicaments | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB1296544 ; | [X]US3759944 (WHYTE BLACK J, et al); | [X]US3954982 (BLACK JAMES WHYTE, et al); | [E]EP0420396 (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]) | [A] - TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, vol. 10, no. 4, April 1989, pages 159-162; J.F. VAN DER WERF et al.: "The histamine H3 receptor: a general presynaptic histaminergic regulatory system?" | Examination | - Schayer et al 1970 J. Neurochem. 17;1649-1654 |