EP0455543 - Device for pointing a reflector antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA ESPACE 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states MATRA ESPACE 4, rue de Presbourg F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muller, Gérard 2, Résidence les Casseaux F-91140 Villebon/Yvette / FR | 02 /
Souliac, Michel 7, rue Carmen F-94240 L'Hay les Roses / FR | 03 /
Bruneau, Bertrand 1 bis Rue Gager-Gabillot F-75015 Paris / FR | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401103.6 | 25.04.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | FR19900005479 | 30.04.1990 Original published format: FR 9005479 | [1991/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455543 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455543 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, H01Q1/28 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
H01Q1/125 (EP);
H01Q1/288 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ausrichtung einer Reflektorantenne | [1991/45] | English: | Device for pointing a reflector antenna | [1991/45] | French: | Dispositif de pointage d'un réflecteur d'antenne | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.08.1994 | NL | 10.08.1994 | SE | 10.11.1994 | DE | 11.11.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [1995/29] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
DE | 11.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
DE | 11.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | DE | 11.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3835316 ; | [A]FR2502404 ; | [A]GB2127624 ; | [A]DE3411838 ; | [A]FR2578687 |