EP0457653 - Safety sleeve and device for wells, particularly for a subterranean reservoir of fluid under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Française de Stockage Géologique "GEOSTOCK" 7, rue E. et A. Peugeot F-92563 Rueil Malmaison Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states Société Française de Stockage Géologique "GEOSTOCK" 7, rue E. et A. Peugeot F-92563 Rueil Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaix, Jean 11 bis, avenue de Villepreux F-92420 Vaucresson / FR | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401193.7 | 07.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | FR19900005931 | 11.05.1990 Original published format: FR 9005931 | FR19910000059 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100059 | [1991/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457653 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457653 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/10, E21B17/18, E21B33/122, E21B43/12, E21B43/14, B65G5/00 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
E21B17/18 (EP,US);
E21B33/122 (EP,US);
E21B34/10 (EP,US);
E21B43/14 (EP,US);
E21B43/28 (EP,US);
E21B43/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/47] | Title | German: | Sicherheitshülse und Vorrichtung für Bohrlöcher, insbesondere für ein unterirdischen unter Druck stehenden Flüssigkeitsbehälter | [1991/47] | English: | Safety sleeve and device for wells, particularly for a subterranean reservoir of fluid under pressure | [1991/47] | French: | Manchon de sécurité pour puits communiquant notamment avec une réserve souterraine de fluide sous pression, ensemble de sécurité et procédé d'exploitation de puits associés | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 22.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2994200 (CARPENTER PAUL G); | [A]US3008522 (FREDD JOHN V, et al); | [A]US3277654 (SHIVER AMOS J); | [A]US3313350 (PAGE JR JOHN S); | [A]USRE28588E ; | [A]US4312415 (FRANKS JR ROBERT L); | [A]US4423782 (BOWYER MICHAEL L [GB]) |