EP0457681 - Devices for fastening decorative strips or similar to vehicle bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMET 27, avenue Etienne Audibert F-60304 Senlis Cédex / FR | [1991/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouery, Roger 18, rue Damremont F-75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
Leblaye, Gérard 7, allée Eugénie Cotton - Appt 539 F-93100 Montreuil / FR | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Behaghel, Pierre, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84 rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | [1991/47] | Application number, filing date | 91401259.6 | 15.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | FR19900006175 | 17.05.1990 Original published format: FR 9006175 | [1991/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457681 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457681 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
B60R13/04 (EP);
F16B5/123 (EP);
F16B5/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [1991/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen zum Befestigen von Zierleisten oder ähnlichem an Karosserien | [1991/47] | English: | Devices for fastening decorative strips or similar to vehicle bodies | [1991/47] | French: | Perfectionnements aux dispositifs pour fixer sur des carrosseries des pièces de parement ou analogues | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 29.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1500930 ; | [A]FR2131454 ; | [A]GB2127730 |