EP0458694 - Lens barrel for camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Satoshi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401309.9 | 21.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | JP19900130580 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: JP 13058090 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0458694 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0458694 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458694 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/10 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
G02B7/10 (EP,KR,US);
G03B3/10 (KR);
G03B5/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/48] | Title | German: | Linsentubus für Kamera | [1991/48] | English: | Lens barrel for camera | [1991/48] | French: | Tube de lentille pour caméra | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1130114 ; | [A]JP63013138 ; | [A]JP1265214 ; | [A]FR2306459 (STAHL CURT [US]); | [Y]US4534624 (TODA KATUHIKO [JP], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 375 (P-921)(3723) 21 August 1989 & JP-A-1 130 114 ( FUJI ) 23 May 1989, & JP1130114 A 19890523 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 216 (P-719)(3063) 21 June 1988 & JP-A-63 013 138 ( PIONEER ) 20 January 1988, & JP63013138 A 19880120 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 25 (P-991)(3968) 18 January 1990 & JP-A-1 265 214 ( HITACHI ) 23 October 1989, & JP1265214 A 19891023 |