EP0461003 - Concurrent cyclone separator and its applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauthier, Thierry 13, Allée des Muses F-69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | 02 /
Bergougnou, Maurice 24, Foxchapel Road London, Out, N6G122 / CA | 03 /
Briens, Cédric 5 Doon Drive London, Ontario / CA | 04 /
Galtier, Pierre Centre Hospitalier Mont Salomon B.P. 127 F-38209 Vienne Cedex / FR | [1991/50] | Application number, filing date | 91401388.3 | 29.05.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | FR19900006937 | 05.06.1990 Original published format: FR 9006937 | [1991/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461003 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461003 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B04C3/00, B04C7/00 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
B04C7/00 (EP,US);
B04C3/00 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1991/50] | Title | German: | Gleichstrom-Zyklonabtrennvorrichtung und ihre Anwendungen | [1991/50] | English: | Concurrent cyclone separator and its applications | [1991/50] | French: | Séparateur cyclonique à cocourant et ses applications | [1991/50] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1992 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 20.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3955948 (CAMPOLONG JOSEPH); | [AD]US4746340 (DURRE REYNOLD F [US], et al); | [A]FR957755 ; | [A]FR2389417 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]); | [A]DE3043729 (PAPCEL CELULOSY NP [CS]); | [A]US4206174 (HEFFLEY SCOTT A [US], et al) | [AD] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTH ENGINEERING FOUNDATION CONFERENCE ON FLUIDIZATION, Elsinore, 18-23 mai 1986, pages 473-480, New York, US; R.G. GRAHAM et al.: "The ultra-rapid fluidized (URF) reactor: application to determine the kinetics of the fast pyrolysis (ultrapyrolysis) of cellulose" |