EP0459896 - Method and apparatus for investigating the visco-elastic behaviour of a viscoelastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/49] | Method and apparatus for investigating the visco-elastic behaviour of a material, especially an elastomer | ||
[1993/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHE APPLIQUEE SUR LES POLYMERES( I.R.A.P.) 72, avenue Olivier Messiaen F-72000 Le Mans / FR | For all designated states CENTRE DE COOPERATION INTERNATIONALE EN RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE POUR LE DEVELOPPEMENT (C.I.R.A.D.) 42, rue Scheffer 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHE APPLIQUEE SUR LES POLYMERES( I.R.A.P.) 72, avenue Olivier Messiaen F-72000 Le Mans / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE DE COOPERATION INTERNATIONALE EN RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE POUR LE DEVELOPPEMENT (C.I.R.A.D.) 42, rue Scheffer F-75116 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHE APPLIQUEE SUR LES POLYMERES( I.R.A.P.) 72, avenue Olivier Messiaen F-72000 Le Mans / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES SUR LE CAOUTCHOUC ( IRCA) 42, rue Scheffer F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chasset, René 29Bis Boulevard de Strasbourg F-94130 Nogent Sur Marne / US | 02 /
Mary, Jean-Luc rue de Touraine F-72190 Saint Pavace / FR | 03 /
Benoist, Pascale 15, rue de la Pastière F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 04 /
de Livonniere, Hugues 90, rue du Bac F-75007 Paris / FR | [1993/36] |
Former [1991/49] | 01 /
Chasset, René 29Bis Boulevard de Strasbourg F-94130 Nogent Sur Marne / US | ||
02 /
Mary, Jean-Luc rue de Touraine F-72190 Saint Pavace / FR | |||
03 /
Benoist, Pascal 15, rue de la Pastière F-72000 Le Mans / FR | |||
04 /
de Livonniere, Hugues 90, rue du Bac F-75007 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401390.9 | 29.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | FR19900006881 | 01.06.1990 Original published format: FR 9006881 | [1991/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459896 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459896 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/08, G01N11/00 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
G01N3/08 (EP);
G01N11/00 (EP);
G01N2203/0094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung des viskoelastischen Verhaltens eines viskoelastischen Werkstoffs | [1993/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for investigating the visco-elastic behaviour of a viscoelastic material | [1993/36] | French: | Procédé de caractérisation du comportement visco-élastique d'un matériau viscoélastique et appareillage pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1993/36] |
Former [1991/49] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung des viskoelastischen Verhaltens eines Werkstoffs, insbesondere eines Elastomers | ||
Former [1991/49] | Method and apparatus for investigating the visco-elastic behaviour of a material, especially an elastomer | ||
Former [1991/49] | Procédé de caractérisation du comportement visco-élastique d'un matériau, notamment du type élastomère et appareillage pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | Examination procedure | 16.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.1993 | DE | 08.09.1993 | DK | 08.09.1993 | ES | 08.09.1993 | GB | 08.09.1993 | GR | 08.09.1993 | IT | 08.09.1993 | NL | 08.09.1993 | SE | 08.09.1993 | BE | 31.05.1994 | CH | 31.05.1994 | LI | 31.05.1994 | LU | 31.05.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
DE | 08.09.1993 | ||
DK | 08.09.1993 | ||
GB | 08.09.1993 | ||
GR | 08.09.1993 | ||
IT | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1994 | ||
CH | 31.05.1994 | ||
LI | 31.05.1994 | ||
LU | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
DE | 08.09.1993 | ||
DK | 08.09.1993 | ||
GB | 08.09.1993 | ||
IT | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1994 | ||
CH | 31.05.1994 | ||
LI | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
DE | 08.09.1993 | ||
DK | 08.09.1993 | ||
GB | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1994 | ||
CH | 31.05.1994 | ||
LI | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
DE | 08.09.1993 | ||
GB | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1994 | ||
CH | 31.05.1994 | ||
LI | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
DE | 08.09.1993 | ||
GB | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1994 | ||
LI | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1994/41] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
DE | 08.09.1993 | ||
GB | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
DE | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | DE | 08.09.1993 | |
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | DE | 08.09.1993 | |
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | DE | 08.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU1339436 ; | [A]US3457779 (HAHN EDWARD E, et al); | [AD]US4109516 (FUXA JAN); | [YD]FR2429423 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]FR2491213 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]); | [AD]US4383450 (PRINGIERS PIERRE [BE], et al) | [Y] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, semaine 8816, 21 avril 1988, abrégé no. 88-111046/16, Derwent Publications Ltd, Londres, GB, & SU-A-1339436 (AS UKR CRYOBIOLOGY), & SU1339436 A 00000000 |