EP0461954 - Rotating device for a disengageable ropeway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POMAGALSKI S.A. 11, rue René Camphin 38600 Fontaine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states POMAGALSKI S.A. 11, rue René Camphin F-38600 Fontaine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarassoff, Serge 9, rue Laurent Darves F-38170 Seyssinet-Pariset / FR | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Kern, Paul, et al 206, Cours de la Libération 38100 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Kern, Paul, et al 206, Cours de la Libération F-38100 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401448.5 | 03.06.1991 | [1991/51] | Priority number, date | FR19900007598 | 13.06.1990 Original published format: FR 9007598 | [1991/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461954 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461954 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/10, B61B12/02 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
B61B12/105 (EP,US);
B61B12/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, IT, LI [1991/51] | Title | German: | Taktgeber für eine kuppelbare Seilschwebebahn | [1991/51] | English: | Rotating device for a disengageable ropeway | [1991/51] | French: | Dispositif cadenceur d'un téléporteur débrayable | [1991/51] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0114129 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]); | [Y]EP0179708 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]); | [A]EP0355084 (DOPPELMAYR & SOHN [AT]) |