Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0463966
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.10.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] |
09.10.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] |
21.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.03.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.11.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.11.1996 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.01.1995 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] |
17.09.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] |
12.05.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] |
30.04.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] |
15.11.1991 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] |