EP0467744 - Procedure and apparatus for transmission by bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | [1992/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gass, Raymond 18, rue des Vergers, Bolsenheim F-67150 Erstein / FR | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 91401883.3 | 08.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | FR19900008750 | 10.07.1990 Original published format: FR 9008750 | [1992/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467744 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467744 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/413 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
H04L12/40013 (EP,US);
H04L12/4135 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/04] | H04L12/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Busübertragung | [1992/04] | English: | Procedure and apparatus for transmission by bus | [1992/04] | French: | Procédé et agencement de transmission par bus | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 13.09.1995 | SE | 13.12.1995 | [1998/15] |
Former [1996/23] | SE | 13.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0122765 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]US4768189 (GOPINATH BHASKARPILLAI [US], et al); | [A]EP0294133 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]US4899143 (GOPINATH BHASKARPILLAI [US], et al) |