EP0467747 - New crystals of radical lithium phthalocyanine, process for the preparation thereof and their use for "in vivo" determination of molecular oxygen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moussavi, Mehdi 20 rue Joseph Rolland F-38120 Saint Egreve / FR | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1992/04] | Application number, filing date | 91401886.6 | 08.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | FR19900008739 | 10.07.1990 Original published format: FR 9008739 | [1992/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467747 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467747 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/50, C09B47/04, C07D487/22, A61K49/00 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
C07D487/22 (EP,US);
A61K49/0002 (EP,US);
C09B47/045 (EP,US);
C09B67/0026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [1992/04] | Title | German: | Neue Kristalle von radikalischem Lithium-Phthalocyanin, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung zur in vivo-Dosierung von molekularem Sauerstoff | [1992/04] | English: | New crystals of radical lithium phthalocyanine, process for the preparation thereof and their use for "in vivo" determination of molecular oxygen | [1992/04] | French: | Nouveaux cristaux de phtalocyanine de lithium radicalaire, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation pour le dosage "in vivo" de l'oxygène moléculaire | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 14.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2181M (PHILIPPE BARRAL [FR]); | [A]EP0352182 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE vol. 85, 1989, ORLANDO, US pages 50 - 59; R.K. WOODS ET AL.: 'spectral-spatial esr imaging as a method of noninvasive biological oxymetry ' | Examination | - J.chem.Soc.chem.Commu.1986,962-3-Sugimoto et al. |