EP0470004 - A highly purified 1-aminopropanediol-2,3 and a method for the purification thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu 590 / JP | ||
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyama, Hiroshi 13-5, Kuba 4-chome Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Takemoto, Etsuo 257-51, Ohno-cho Saiki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402167.0 | 01.08.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | JP19900204395 | 01.08.1990 Original published format: JP 20439590 | JP19910166603 | 08.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16660391 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470004 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470004 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C213/10, C07C215/10 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
C07C215/10 (EP,US);
C07C213/10 (EP,US);
Y10S159/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | Hochreines 1-Aminopropandiol-2,3 und Verfahren zur Reinigung dieser Verbindung | [1992/06] | English: | A highly purified 1-aminopropanediol-2,3 and a method for the purification thereof | [1992/06] | French: | Amino-1 propanediol-2,3 purifié à fond et procédé pour la purification de ce composé | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 27.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.1995
28.11.1995
ADMISSIBLE Borregaard Fine Chemicals A.S. P.O. Box 100 1701 Sarpsborg / NO Opponent's representative Altenburg, Udo Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.1995
28.11.1995
ADMISSIBLE Borregaard Fine Chemicals A.S. P.O. Box 100 1701 Sarpsborg / NO Opponent's representative Altenburg, Udo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.1995
28.11.1995
ADMISSIBLE Borregaard Fine Chemicals A.S. P.O. Box 100 1701 Sarpsborg / NO Opponent's representative Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | 01.12.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.05.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.04.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/33] | 22.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 14.07.1997 | Appeal received No. T0780/97 | 25.09.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.06.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 22.06.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 18.04.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4356323 (KLEEMANN AXEL, et al); | [Y]EP0075929 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |