EP0481831 - System for mounting a torsion bar on a vehicle suspension arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penot, Jean 127, Avenue de la République F-94800 Villejuif / FR | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402264.5 | 19.08.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | FR19900011567 | 19.09.1990 Original published format: FR 9011567 | [1992/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481831 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/055 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
B60G21/0551 (EP);
B60G21/051 (EP);
B60G2200/21 (EP);
B60G2200/22 (EP);
B60G2202/1362 (EP);
B60G2206/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1992/17] | Title | German: | Befestigung eines Drehstabes auf einem Lenker einer Fahrzeug-Radaufhängung | [1992/17] | English: | System for mounting a torsion bar on a vehicle suspension arm | [1992/17] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'une barre de torsion sur un bras de suspension de véhicule | [1992/17] | File destroyed: | 17.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/24] | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2794632 ; | [A]FR939941 ; | [A]US3198507 ; | [A]DE3742869 |