EP0480780 - Optoelectronic device and production of a laser and a photodetector using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Razeghi, Manijeh THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 02 /
Omnes, Franck THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402304.9 | 23.08.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | FR19900010871 | 31.08.1990 Original published format: FR 9010871 | [1992/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480780 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352, H01L33/00, H01S3/19 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
H01S5/34313 (EP);
B82Y20/00 (EP);
H01L31/0352 (EP);
H01L31/035236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/16] | Title | German: | Optoelektronische Vorrichtung und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung eines Lasers und eines Fotodetektors | [1992/16] | English: | Optoelectronic device and production of a laser and a photodetector using the same | [1992/16] | French: | Dispositif optoélectronique et application à la réalisation d'un laser et d'un photodétecteur | [1992/16] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/29] | 01.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/35] | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0426419 | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 56, no. 23, 4 Juin 1990, NEW YORK, US pages 2293 - 2294; N.K. DUTTA ET AL.: 'Linewidth enhancement factor in strained quantum well lasers' | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 53, no. 1, 4 Juillet 1988, NEW YORK, US pages 1 - 3; M. KITIMURA ET AL.: 'High-power operation in InGaAs separate confinement heterostructure quantum well laser diodes' | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 47, no. 7, Octobre 1985, NEW YORK, US pages 733 - 735; G.E. BULMAN ET AL.: 'Photocurrent multiplication in ion implanted lateral In0.2Ga0.8As/GaAs strained-layer superlattice photodetectors' | [A] - IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS vol. 1, no. 11, Novembre 1989, NEW YORK, US pages 376 - 378; F.S. CHOA ET AL.: 'Optoelectronic properties of InGaAs/InGaAsP multiple-quantum-well waveguide detectors' |