EP0473513 - Set for air conditioning and production of compressed air for a railway traction unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chappet, Philippe 6, Domaine du Bois Joli F-90200 Cravanche / FR | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 91402326.2 | 28.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | FR19900010711 | 28.08.1990 Original published format: FR 9010711 | [1992/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473513 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B61C17/04, B60H1/00, F24F3/14, B01D53/26 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
B60H1/00378 (EP);
B01D53/265 (EP);
B61C17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/10] | Title | German: | Aggregat zur Klimatisierung und Erzeugung von Druckluft für ein Schienentriebfahrzeug | [1992/10] | English: | Set for air conditioning and production of compressed air for a railway traction unit | [1992/10] | French: | Ensemble de climatisation et de production d'air comprimé pour engin de traction ferroviaire | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/36] | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3848428 ; | [A]DE3638875 | [A] - ENERGIE FLUIDE vol. 22, no. 1, Janvier 1983, PARIS FR pages 34 - 39; 'SECHEUR PAR REFRIGERATION: LA TECHNOLOGIE D¡ UN TRAITEMENT SUR MESURE' |