Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3212600B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2001 | B2 | JPH06502140 | 10.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | FR9100820 | 18.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0139421B | 01.06.1998 | B1 | KR930702249 | 08.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | FR9100820 | 18.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9207806 | Global Dossier | 14.05.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8851291 | Global Dossier | 26.05.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0482984 | Global Dossier | 24.05.1995 | B1 | EP0482984 | 29.04.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE123010T | 15.06.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE482984T | 02.09.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69110000T | 16.11.1995 | T2 | DE69110000D1 | 29.06.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2075387T | 01.10.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2668478 | 25.06.1993 | B1 | FR2668478 | 30.04.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5212123 | 18.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9013168 | 24.10.1990 |