EP0482984 - Refractory material bonded by a sialon matrix and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAVOIE REFRACTAIRES 10 rue de l'Industrie F-69631 Venissieux / FR | [1992/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoennhal, Jacques Paul Raymond 4 Allée Marcel Achard F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | De Boisse, Louis, et al CABINET de BOISSE 37, Avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | de Boisse, Louis Arnaud, et al CABINET de BOISSE 37, Avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402781.8 | 18.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | FR19900013168 | 24.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9013168 | [1992/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482984 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482984 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/66, C04B35/65, B22D41/54, B22D41/32 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
C04B35/65 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/66 (EP,KR,US);
B22D41/32 (EP,KR,US);
B22D41/54 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | Feuerfest Erzeugnisse durch eine Sialon-Matrix gebunden und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1992/18] | English: | Refractory material bonded by a sialon matrix and process for its production | [1992/18] | French: | Matériaux réfractaires liés par une matrice de sialon et procédé de préparation | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5884914 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO, et al); | [A]DE3320016 (DRESSER IND [US]); | [A]EP0242849 (VESUVIUS CRUCIBLE CO [US]); | [A]EP0309225 (VESUVIUS CRUCIBLE CO [US]); | [AD]EP0317980 (NORTON CO [US]) |