EP0484205 - Heating and ventilating device for a motor vehicle interior [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière F-78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robin, Roger 7 Clos du Gandouget, Les Elancourtines F-78990 Elancourt / FR | 02 /
Bouvot, Jean-François 2, rue des Grands Prés, Le Mesnil-Sévin F-78720 Dampierre / FR | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402830.3 | 23.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | FR19900013568 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9013568 | [1992/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484205 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484205 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B60H1/00042 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Heizung und Belüftung des Fahrgastraums eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1992/19] | English: | Heating and ventilating device for a motor vehicle interior | [1992/19] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage et de ventilation de l'habitacle d'un véhicule automobile | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Request for further processing for: | 20.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1455640 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [Y]DE2655554 (AUDI AG); | [A]US4223754 (MIZUNO HIROSHI, et al); | [A]EP0102611 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [Y]FR2631287 (VALEO [FR]) |