EP0483006 - Stalk removing apparatus for vegetables like broccoli [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turatti, Antonio La Petite Marchanderie, 68, rue de Tours F-49650 Allonnes / FR | [1992/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402835.2 | 23.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | FR19900013317 | 26.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9013317 | [1992/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483006 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483006 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23N15/00 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
A23N15/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT [1992/18] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Entstrunken von Gemüsen wie Broccoli | [1992/18] | English: | Stalk removing apparatus for vegetables like broccoli | [1992/18] | French: | Etrogneuse pour végétaux du type brocolis | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 10.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.06.1994 | GB | 08.06.1994 | IT | 08.06.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 08.06.1994 | |
IT | 08.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | GB | 08.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR813818 ; | [A]US3646977 (GOODALE RICHARD J); | [A]FR2116868 (BAPTISTAL PIERRE [FR], et al); | [A]US4658714 (MCILVAIN JACK R [US], et al); | [A]US4773324 (WYLIE JOHN V [US], et al) |