EP0486345 - Process for the production of non-alcoholic beer and beer aroma [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CECA S.A. 4 - 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states CECA S.A. 4 - 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anglerot, Didier 466, Chemin Salié F-64140 Lons / FR | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Haicour, Philippe Godefroy, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle. 4-8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris Cédex 42 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Haicour, Philippe, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A., D.P.I. 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cédex 42 F-92091 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402838.6 | 23.10.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | FR19900013307 | 26.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9013307 | [1992/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486345 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486345 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/08 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C12H3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von alkoholfreiem Bier und Bieraroma | [1992/21] | English: | Process for the production of non-alcoholic beer and beer aroma | [1992/21] | French: | Procédé de production de bière sans alcool et d'arôme de bière | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 15.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1034945 ; | [AD]EP0101254 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]); | [AD]FR2564451 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]); | [A]EP0228572 (ECKES FA PETER [DE]); | [Y]EP0231072 (DISTILLERS CO [GB]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 224 (C-599)(3572) 24 Mei 1989; & JP-A-1 034 945 (JGC CORP) 6 Fevrier 1989, & JP1034945 A 00000000 |