EP0487368 - Antipolluting treatment of a used refining catalyst and recuperation of metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trinh Dinh, Chan 7, Allée des Oeillets F-78110 Le Vesinet / FR | 02 /
Llido, Eric Le Clos des Vignes F-69360 Serezin du Rhone / FR | [1992/22] | Application number, filing date | 91402873.3 | 25.10.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | FR19900013601 | 30.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9013601 | [1992/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0487368 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0487368 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487368 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C22B7/00, C22B3/36, C22B3/14, C22B3/30, B01J23/94, B01J38/64, C22B34/36, C22B34/34, C22B34/22, C22B23/02 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
B01J23/94 (EP);
B01J38/64 (EP);
C22B23/026 (EP);
C22B23/0446 (EP);
C22B3/12 (EP);
C22B3/30 (EP);
C22B3/364 (EP);
C22B34/225 (EP);
C22B34/345 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, IT, LU, NL [1992/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur umweltfreundlichen Behandlung eines Raffinierungskatalysators sowie Rückgewinnung von Metallen | [1992/22] | English: | Antipolluting treatment of a used refining catalyst and recuperation of metals | [1992/22] | French: | Procédé de traitement antipollution d'un catalyseur de raffinage à l'état usé et récupération des métaux | [1992/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4145397 (TOIDA SHIGEO, et al); | [X]US4514368 (HUBRED GALE L [US]); | [X]EP0244014 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US4514369 (HUBRED GALE L [US], et al); | [A]US4500495 (HUBRED GALE L [US], et al); | [A]US4432953 (HUBRED GALE L [US], et al); | [A]US4434141 (HUBRED GALE L [US], et al); | [A]US4670229 (WIEWIOROWSKI EDWARD I [US], et al) |