EP0485259 - Process and apparatus for homogenisation in a tubular hydrocarbon cracking reactor with fluid solid particles, of the mixture of these particles and the hydrocarbon gases to be treated [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION S.A. 84, rue de Villiers 92538 Levallois Perret Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION S.A. 84, rue de Villiers F-92538 Levallois Perret Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demoulin, Vincent 66, rue de Lourmel F-75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
Fersing, Marc 24, rue Chef de Caux F-76310 Saint Adresse / FR | 03 /
Patureaux, Thierry 10, rue des Frênes, Fontaine Le Mallet F-76290 Montivilliers / FR | 04 /
Pontvianne, Denis 2, rue Jules Guesde F-92120 Montrouge / FR | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402913.7 | 30.10.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | FR19900013874 | 08.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9013874 | [1992/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485259 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485259 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung für Homogenisierung in ein röhrenformige Kohlenwasserstoff-Krackreaktor mit Wirbelbett von feste Teilchen, von das Gemisch von diese Teilchen und die zu behandeln Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1992/20] | English: | Process and apparatus for homogenisation in a tubular hydrocarbon cracking reactor with fluid solid particles, of the mixture of these particles and the hydrocarbon gases to be treated | [1992/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'homogénéisation, à l'intérieur d'un réacteur tubulaire de craquage d'hydrocarbures à lit de particules solides fluidisées, du mélange de ces particules et des vapeurs d'hydrocarbures à traiter | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 27.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.1993 | DK | 24.11.1993 | NL | 24.11.1993 | SE | 24.11.1993 | [1998/15] |
Former [1994/39] | AT | 24.11.1993 | |
NL | 24.11.1993 | ||
SE | 24.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 24.11.1993 | |
SE | 24.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/28] | SE | 24.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2585030 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]); | [A]EP0369536 (STONE & WEBSTER ENG CORP [US]); | [APD]FR2654435 (TOTAL FRANCE [FR]) |