EP0485261 - Downhole acoustic transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Schlumberger Limited 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | For:DE
DK
IT
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V. Carnegielaan 12 2517 KM Den Haag / NL | For:NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For:GB
SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | ||
For:DE
DK
IT
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V. Carnegielaan 12 NL-2517 KM Den Haag / NL | |||
For:NL
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ounadjela, Abderrhamane 11, rue de Coulmiers F-75014 Paris / FR | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Hagel, Francis, et al Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Hagel, Francis, et al Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402921.0 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | FR19900013695 | 06.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9013695 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485261 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485261 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/145, G10K9/12 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
G01V1/145 (EP,US);
G10K9/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, IT, NL [1992/20] | Title | German: | Akustischer Wandler für ein Bohrloch | [1992/20] | English: | Downhole acoustic transducer | [1992/20] | French: | Transducteur acoustique pour puits de forage | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 13.09.1995 | IT | 13.09.1995 | NL | 13.09.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2000/27] | DK | 13.09.1995 | |
IT | 13.09.1995 | ||
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 13.09.1995 | |
IT | 13.09.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 13.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1397142 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [A]US4462093 (UPTON RALPH G [US]); | [A]GB2158580 (EXXON PRODUCTION RESEARCH CO); | [AD]US4651044 (KOMPANEK HARRY W [US]); | [A]EP0243591 (ALLIED CORP [US]) |