EP0484248 - A novel superconducting circuit and a process for fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inada, Hiroshi, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Takao, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Iiyama, Michitomo, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402931.9 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | JP19900294294 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29429490 | JP19900294295 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29429590 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0484248 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0484248 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484248 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L23/485, H01L23/498, H01L39/24 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
H01L21/76891 (EP,US);
H10N60/0661 (EP,US);
H01L23/49888 (EP,US);
H01L23/53285 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S505/703 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/19] | H01L21/90, H01L23/485, H01L23/498 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/19] | Title | German: | Supraleitende Schaltung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1992/19] | English: | A novel superconducting circuit and a process for fabricating the same | [1992/19] | French: | Circuit supraconducteur et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1992/19] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/33: Teilanmeldung 95108249.4 eingereicht am 31/10/91 | EPB 1995/33: Divisional application 95108249.4 filed on 31/10/91 | EPB 1995/33: Demande divisionnaire 95108249.4 déposée le 31/10/91 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 07.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95108249.4 / EP0671764 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP01035971 [ ]; | EP0299163 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]); | EP0302354 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0327493 | EP0358879 | EP0410374 |