EP0485275 - Security device with a memory and/or a microprocessor for data processing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL CP8 68 route de Versailles, B.P. 45 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [1998/43] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states BULL CP8 68 route de Versailles, B.P. 45 F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ugon, Michel 6, rue des Cépages F-78310 Maurepas / FR | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Corlu, Bernard Edouard, et al CP8 Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 36-38 rue de la Princesse BP 45 78431 Louveciennes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Corlu, Bernard Edouard, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1992/20] | Siloret, Patrick Bull S.A. Industrial Property Department P.C.: HQ 8M006 B.P. 193.16 121,Avenue de Malakoff F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402961.6 | 05.11.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | FR19900013727 | 06.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9013727 | [1992/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485275 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485275 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F3/033 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/03543 (EP,US);
G06F1/00 (KR);
G06F21/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/0312 (EP,US);
G06K7/0021 (EP,US);
G07C9/22 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0333 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung mit einem Speicher und/oder einem Mikroprozessor für Datenverarbeitungsmaschinen | [1992/20] | English: | Security device with a memory and/or a microprocessor for data processing machines | [1992/20] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité, comportant une mémoire et/ou un microcalculateur pour machines de traitement | [1998/43] |
Former [1992/20] | Dispositif de sécurité, comporatnt une mémoire et/ou un microcalculateur pour machines de traitement | Examination procedure | 13.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.1998 | GR | 21.10.1998 | LU | 05.11.1998 | BE | 30.11.1998 | CH | 30.11.1998 | LI | 30.11.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2001/23] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
GR | 21.10.1998 | ||
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
CH | 30.11.1998 | ||
LI | 30.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
CH | 30.11.1998 | ||
LI | 30.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
CH | 19.06.1999 | ||
LI | 19.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 21.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0183608 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0314530 (MICROPHAR SARL [FR]); | [Y]EP0365918 (IBM [US]) | [A] - ELEKTRONIK. vol. 36, no. 21, 16 octobre 1987, MUNCHEN DE pages 126 - 130; Güntner et al.: "Mehr als eine Tastatur" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 29, no. 5, octobre 1986, NEW YORK US pages 1939 - 1944; "Software protection by decryption on multi-usage serial interface" |