EP0487375 - Article with at least two partitions for storing varied things [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCOIS MAROT S.A. Société anonyme 95, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré F-75008 Paris / FR | [1992/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robinet, Jean-Louis 65, rue Pauline Borghèse F-92200 Neuilly-Sur-Seine / FR | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Caunet, Jean, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Caunet, Jean, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402983.0 | 07.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | FR19900014367 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9014367 | [1992/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487375 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A45C3/00, A45C7/00 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
A45C7/0063 (EP,US);
A45C3/00 (EP,KR,US);
A45C13/02 (EP,US);
A45C2003/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | Artikel mit mindestens zwei Fächern zum Halten von verschiedenen Gegenständen | [1992/22] | English: | Article with at least two partitions for storing varied things | [1992/22] | French: | Article à au moins deux compartiments destinés à contenir des objets variés | [1992/22] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 13.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2608026 (STYL ACTION [FR]); | [A]US2018809 (RODGERS LEO J); | [A]DE3313195 (HECHFELLNER FRANZ JOSEF); | [A]US2025101 (ABRAHAM HALPIN); | [A]US2597194 (SHOLL MORRIS A); | [A]US1636838 (ROSER MATHIAS F); | [A]FR2565471 (ABRAMI RICHARD [FR]); | [A]US2577670 (ADAMS EDWARD E); | [A]FR2070575 (MONTGAILLARD HENRY); | [A]US4236615 (GINAT ESTHER) |