EP0485302 - Camera lens barrel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Hiroshi, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Norikatsu, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakazato, Kunio, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nakayama, Akihito, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403019.2 | 08.11.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | JP19900305443 | 09.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30544390 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0485302 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0485302 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485302 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/10 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
G02B7/102 (EP,KR,US);
G03B3/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/20] | Title | German: | Linsentubus für Kamera | [1992/20] | English: | Camera lens barrel | [1992/20] | French: | Tube de lentille pour caméra | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 26.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4799073 (ASANO SEIJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4862046 (PRESTON HOWARD J [US]) | Examination | EP0394901 |