EP0490715 - Tube mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEFEI CEMENT RESEARCH & DESIGN INSTITUTE OF STATE 44, Wangjiangdonglu, Hefei Anhui 230051 / CN | [1992/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jiang, Yucan 44, Wangjiangdonglu, Hefei Anhui 230051 / CN | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403032.5 | 12.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | CN1990109049 | 13.11.1990 Original published format: CN 90109049 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490715 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490715 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/06 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
B02C17/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/25] | Title | German: | Rohrmühle | [1992/25] | English: | Tube mill | [1992/25] | French: | Broyeur tubulaire | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR562235 (CH CANDLOT ETS); | [A]US1825333 (CATLIN ARTHUR W); | [A]DE549694 (MIAG MUEHLENBAU & IND AG); | [X]GB387407 (VICKERS ARMSTRONGS LTD, et al); | [A]US2079221 (MILLER STARKS L, et al) |