Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |
28.06.1994 | Change - representative | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] |
30.12.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] |
29.11.1993 | Change - applicant | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] |
28.08.1992 | First examination report | |
10.07.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] |
05.06.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] |