Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04293649 | Global Dossier | 19.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9016025 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0495324 | Global Dossier | 16.02.1994 | B1 | EP0495324 | 22.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9016025 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69101218T | 16.06.1994 | T2 | DE69101218D1 | 24.03.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9016025 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2051097T | 01.06.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9016025 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2670731 | 26.03.1993 | B1 | FR2670731 | 26.06.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9016025 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5188438 | 23.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9016025 | 20.12.1990 |