EP0488859 - Device for dumping torsions, for a disck cluch of a automobile vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen F-75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dalbiez, André 58, rue de Jolival F-95100 Argenteuil / FR | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403151.3 | 22.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | FR19900014872 | 28.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9014872 | [1992/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0488859 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488859 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12, F16D13/68 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
F16F15/127 (EP,US);
F16F15/1238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1992/23] | Title | German: | Drehschwingungsdämpfer, insbesondere für Automobil-Scheibenkupplungen | [1992/23] | English: | Device for dumping torsions, for a disck cluch of a automobile vehicle | [1992/23] | French: | Dispositif amortisseur de torsion, notamment pour disque d'embrayage de vehicule automobile | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Request for further processing for: | 15.06.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2386729 (FERODO SA [FR]); | [AD]GB2089472 (VALEO); | [A]EP0174233 (VALEO [FR]) | Examination | EP0463941 |