EP0491586 - Use in anaesthesia and pharmaceutical compositions of (S)-isoflurane and (S)-desflurane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEPRACOR, INC. 33 Locke Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [1992/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Young, James W. 295 Still River Road Still River, MA 01467 / US | 02 /
Brandt, Steven 116 C Broadmeadow Road Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403169.5 | 22.11.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | US19900619780 | 29.11.1990 Original published format: US 619780 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491586 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491586 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/08 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/02 (EP,US);
A61K31/08 (EP,US);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | Verwendung von (S)-Isofluran und (S)-Desfluran zur Anästhesie sowie entsprechende Arzneimittelzubereitungen | [1992/26] | English: | Use in anaesthesia and pharmaceutical compositions of (S)-isoflurane and (S)-desflurane | [1992/26] | French: | Utilisation de (S)-isoflurane et (S)-desflurane dans l'anesthésie et compositions pharmaceutiques | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.1996 | BE | 25.09.1996 | CH | 25.09.1996 | DK | 25.09.1996 | ES | 25.09.1996 | GR | 25.09.1996 | IT | 25.09.1996 | LI | 25.09.1996 | NL | 25.09.1996 | LU | 30.11.1996 | SE | 25.12.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
CH | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
ES | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
LI | 25.09.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
CH | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
LI | 25.09.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
CH | 30.12.1996 | ||
LI | 30.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 25.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3535388 (TERRELL ROSS C); | [A]US3897502 (RUSSELL JAMES P, et al); | [Y]DE2656545 (HOECHST AG); | [Y]EP0285237 (BOC INC [US]) | [XP] - SCIENCE, vol. 254, no. 5030, 18th October 1991, pages 427-430; N.P. FRANKS et al.: "Stereospecific effects of inhalational general anesthetic optical isomers on nerve ion channels" | [XP] - SCIENCE, vol. 251, February 1991, pages 560-561; J. MEINWALD et al.: "Inhalational anesthetics stereochemistry: optical resolution of halothane, enflurane, and isoflurane" | [Y] - J.E.F. REYNOLDS: "Martindale, The Extra Pharmacopoeia", 29th edition, 1989, The Pharmaceutical Press, London, GB | [Y] - ANESTHESIOLOGY, vol. 39, no. 5, November 1973, pages 518-524; J.J. KENDIG et al.: "Halothane stereoisomers: lack of stereospecificity in two model systems" |