EP0489639 - Fiberweb for compressing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1992/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demars, Yves 237, rue de l'Empire Gicourt F-60600 Agnetz / FR | 02 /
Szalata, François 21, rue des Lilas, Laigneville F-60290 Rantigny / FR | 03 /
Decoopman, Christian Route de Bulles, Fournival F-60130 St Just en Chausse / FR | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc-BP 135 F-93303 Aubervilliers Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403262.8 | 03.12.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | FR19900015279 | 06.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015279 | [1992/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489639 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489639 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/72 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
D04H1/74 (EP);
D04H1/60 (EP,KR);
D01G25/00 (EP);
D04H1/4209 (EP);
D04H1/4218 (EP);
D04H1/4274 (EP);
D04H1/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/24] | Title | German: | Fasermatte für Pressteile | [1992/24] | English: | Fiberweb for compressing | [1992/24] | French: | Matelas fibreux destiné au pressage | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.1997 | DK | 26.02.1997 | ES | 26.02.1997 | FR | 26.02.1997 | GB | 26.02.1997 | IT | 26.02.1997 | NL | 26.02.1997 | SE | 26.05.1997 | DE | 27.05.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
ES | 26.02.1997 | ||
FR | 26.02.1997 | ||
GB | 26.02.1997 | ||
IT | 26.02.1997 | ||
NL | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/32] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
ES | 26.02.1997 | ||
FR | 26.02.1997 | ||
GB | 26.02.1997 | ||
IT | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
ES | 26.02.1997 | ||
GB | 26.02.1997 | ||
IT | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GB | 26.02.1997 | ||
IT | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GB | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
GB | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
GB | 26.02.1997 | ||
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DE | 27.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 26.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1021781 (GRUENZWEIG & HARTMANN); | [X]US3004878 (TOMLINSON JAMES A); | [X]FR2268570 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]); | [A]US4146564 (GARRICK JOHN R, et al); | [Y]EP0099801 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]); | [XD]EP0371847 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) |