Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] |
02.12.1993 | First examination report | |
21.11.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] |
24.04.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] |