EP0490756 - Method for producing a workpiece of a non-malleable material at room temperatur by hot spinning and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duquesnoy, Gérard 35 Lotissement Les Pastourelles F-13300 Salon de Provence / FR | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/11] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/25] | Mongrédien, André c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403341.0 | 10.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | FR19900015570 | 12.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015570 | [1992/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490756 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490756 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/16 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
B21D22/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines aus einem bei Umgebungstemperatur nicht-schmiedbaren Material bestehenden Teiles, und entsprechendes Werkzeug | [1992/25] | English: | Method for producing a workpiece of a non-malleable material at room temperatur by hot spinning and apparatus therefor | [1992/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication par fluotournage à chaud d'une pièce en un matériau non malléable à température ambiante et outillage correspondant | [1994/24] |
Former [1992/25] | Procédé de fabrication par fluotournage à chaud d'une pièce en un matériau non malléalble à température ambiante et outillage correspondant | Examination procedure | 24.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1394105 ; | [X]FR994560 ; | [Y]FR2389428 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) |