EP0494557 - Pressure-limiting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forges de Belles Ondes 8, rue Blanche F-75009 Paris / FR | [1992/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faubeau, Edmond 1, rue Gaetan Pirou F-95580 Andilly / FR | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Peuscet, Jacques, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Peuscet, Jacques, et al SCP Cabinet Peuscet et Autres, 68, rue d'Hauteville F-75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403402.0 | 16.12.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | FR19900016537 | 31.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9016537 | [1992/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494557 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494557 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/196, F16K17/06 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
B60G17/056 (EP);
B61F5/14 (EP);
F16K17/06 (EP);
F16K17/196 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1992/29] | Title | German: | Druckbegrenzungsvorrichtung | [1992/29] | English: | Pressure-limiting device | [1992/29] | French: | Appareil limiteur de pression | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.08.1995 | IT | 02.08.1995 | GB | 16.12.1995 | BE | 31.12.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 02.08.1995 | |
GB | 16.12.1995 | ||
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/14] | GB | 16.12.1995 | |
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 31.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8902047 ; | [Y]US2028755 ; | [Y]US4090545 ; | [Y]CH326823 ; | [X]US2351874 |