EP0441723 - Automatic colour television standard indentification method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/33] | Automatic colour television identification method | ||
[1995/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS SA 7, Avenue Galliéni F-94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imbert, Michel Résidence Chartreuse Beauregard F-38500 Coublevie / FR | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion F-38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 91420035.7 | 04.02.1991 | [1991/33] | Priority number, date | FR19900001623 | 06.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001623 | [1991/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0441723 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0441723 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
H04N9/642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/33] | Title | German: | Automatisches Verfahren zur Farbfernsehnormidentifizierung | [1991/33] | English: | Automatic colour television standard indentification method | [1995/01] | French: | Procédé d'identification automatique d'un standard de télévision couleur | [1991/33] |
Former [1991/33] | Automatic colour television identification method | Examination procedure | 16.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0162443 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [A] - ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND APPLICATIONS. vol. 7, no. 1, 1985, EINDHOVEN NL pages 24 - 36; Andries Smaal: "Single-chip multi-standard colour decoder" |